Gano v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Venerando M. Gano
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2016cv04358
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE LATE OPPOSITION; AND FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/31/17. Show Cause Response due by 11/7/2017. Reply due by 11/10/17. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 23, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/23/17. Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2017. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
August 4, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gano v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venerando M. Gano
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?