Adamson v. City & County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Lorenzo Adamson
Defendant: City & County San Francisco and Gregory Suhr
Case Number: 3:2016cv04370
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying in part and granting in part 26 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Denying Motion to Strike. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
December 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 9, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/09/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamson v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Adamson
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?