MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. et al v. MERS, Inc, et al

Plaintiff: MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Defendant: MERS, Inc and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS)
Case Number: 3:2016cv04380
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/3/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
September 21, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 , 20 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/21/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 20, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 29, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER RE SERVICE (granting 18 ). Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/29/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 23, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER RE SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/23/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. et al v. MERS, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Benjamin Herring
Represented By: Adaline J. Hilgard
Represented By: Robert Nathan Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Benjamin Herring
Represented By: Adaline J. Hilgard
Represented By: Robert Nathan Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?