Salinas v. States Recovery System

Plaintiff: Rosario Salinas
Defendant: States Recovery System
Case Number: 3:2016cv04419
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 17, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 17, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 9, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/9/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas v. States Recovery System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Salinas
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: States Recovery System
Represented By: Mark Ewell Ellis
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Griffith
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?