Kourepis et al v. Sony Europe Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Dimitrios Kourepis and George Damigos
Defendant: Sony Europe Ltd, Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America
Case Number: 3:2016cv04438
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 29 Motion to Remand; terminating 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 15, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 34 Administrative Motion to strike appendix; denying 36 Administrative Motion to file appendix. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
August 19, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING INTERNATIONAL PROCESS SERVER re 17 Letter filed by Dimitrios Kourepis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/19/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kourepis et al v. Sony Europe Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitrios Kourepis
Represented By: Menaka Fernando
Represented By: Jennifer Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Damigos
Represented By: Palmer E. Buchholz
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Europe Ltd
Represented By: Mark A. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Melvin L Felton, II
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Mark A. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?