Olajide v. Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Olanapo Ad Olajide
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Federal Reserve Bank of Boston, Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia, Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland, Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond, Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta, Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago, Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas, Compass Bank and Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2016cv04472
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION TO AMEND OR ALTER JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 22, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
January 13, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND OR ALTER JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 13, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 3, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without further leave to amend. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 3, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
November 4, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. The amended complaint is dismissed. If plaintiff wishes to amend, he shall file his Second Amended Complaint no later than November 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 5, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olajide v. Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olanapo Ad Olajide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Boston
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of New York
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Kansas City
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Bank
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Adam Wolff Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?