Karen Milner v. Dean Wilson et al

Plaintiff: Karen Milner
Defendant: Dean Wilson, Mary Wilson and Does 1-4
Case Number: 3:2016cv04484
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
November 16, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Stipulation RE: CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES Close of Fact Discovery due by 5/30/2017; Designation of Experts due by 7/31/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 8/17/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/31/2017; Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2017 03:00 PM.; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 9/11/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
September 30, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 22, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Milner v. Dean Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Milner
Represented By: Dennis Harris Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?