Ribeiro v. Sedgwick LLP

Plaintiff: Traci Ribeiro
Defendant: Sedgwick LLP
Case Number: 3:2016cv04507
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY AND SETTING DATE FOR FURTHER STATUS REPORT Status Report due by 7/20/2017 AT NOON. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/10/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
January 9, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY AND SETTING DATE FOR FURTHER STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 7, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF by Hon. William Alsup granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 14, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ***CORRECTED*** APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID W. SANFORD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 10, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY DAVID W. SANFORD by Hon. William Alsup denying 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 7, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 10 16 19 . (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 2, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING ACTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
August 31, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND TO EXTEND TIMEre 11 Responses due by 9/20/2016. Replies due by 9/27/2016. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/31/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 17, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANIING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES BRYAN WOOD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 16, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JAMES BRYAN WOOD by Hon. William Alsup denying 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 15, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ribeiro v. Sedgwick LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick LLP
Represented By: Emily Eschenbach Barker
Represented By: Nick C. Geannacopulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Ribeiro
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Represented By: James B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?