B.R & W.R. et al v. Beacon Health Options

Plaintiff: B.R & W.R.
Defendant: Beacon Health Options
Case Number: 3:2016cv04576
Filed: August 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 32 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
May 31, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James vacating June 8, 2017 hearing; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 6/21/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
March 9, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James terminating 14 Motion for Leave to File; granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended complaint. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.R & W.R. et al v. Beacon Health Options
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.R & W.R.
Represented By: Jessica M. Cho
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Health Options
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?