Schmitz v. Sanofi S.A. et al

Plaintiff: Bertha Renee Schmitz
Defendant: Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04619
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Louisina. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
September 9, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR STAY PENDING MDL TRANSFER DECISION; DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties are ordered to file, no later than October 28, 2016, a joint status report if the action has not been transferred by said date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/09/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
August 19, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitz v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Renee Schmitz
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Amy Marie Zeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: G. Gregg Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?