Bristow v. SunPower Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Bristow
Defendant: SunPower Corporation, Thomas H. Werner and Charles D. Boynton
Case Number: 3:2016cv04710
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 83 Scheduling. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
February 23, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 56 CONTINUING DATE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/23/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
January 13, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 53 (1) ESTABLISHING MASTER CASE FILE; (2) SETTING DATE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND (3) CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
December 9, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS AND APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 8, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (12 in 3:16-cv-04915-RS) (38 in 3:16-cv-04710-RS)Regarding Continuance of Case Management Conferences and Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaints. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 14, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE CASES 16-04710 RS, 16-04915 WHO, 16-05312 NC, 16-05381 NC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristow v. SunPower Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bristow
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Lesley F Portnoy
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Howard G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunPower Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Boynton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?