Buckeye Tree Lodge and Sequoia Village Inn, LLC v. Expedia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Buckeye Tree Lodge and Sequoia Village Inn, LLC
Defendant: Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, L.P., Hotels.com GP, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, Trivago, GmbH, Venere Net S.R.L. and Expedia Australia Investments PTY Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04721
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria clarifying Class Definition; denying 199 Motion to Exclude opinions of Dr. Dennis; granting 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 201 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [2 08] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 209 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 210 Administrative Motion re testimony; granting 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 GENERAL ORDER FOR PENDING CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE CHHABRIA. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/12/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER SETTING HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/7/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 195 Motion to Strike. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/21/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 184 Administrative Motion to excuse Plaintiff Prospect Historic Hotel from Personal Attendance at Settlement Conference. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 126 RENEWED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS AND RE OTHER MISCELLANEOUS MOTIONS. Granting 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting as modified 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; gran ting 152 , 157 Motions for Leave to File Surreply and Sur-surreply; and denying 154 , 155 Motions for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefs. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 4/23/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. A Case Management Statement is due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on March 13, 2019. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re Motion to Intervene 127 . The motion is construed as a motion for leave to amend the complaint to add additional named plaintiffs. That motion is granted. The hearing scheduled for October 25, 2018 is vacated. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 69 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs are required to e-file the amended complaint. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckeye Tree Lodge and Sequoia Village Inn, LLC v. Expedia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trivago, GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venere Net S.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Australia Investments PTY Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buckeye Tree Lodge and Sequoia Village Inn, LLC
Represented By: Allison Hughes Goddard
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Mitchell
Represented By: James Richard Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?