Autodesk, Inc. v. Alter et al
Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph Alter and Joseph Alter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04722
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/14/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING 167 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting Autodesk's 142 motion for summary judgment and denying Alter's 130 motion for summary judgment. The parties shall indicate within seven days of this motion whether any further claims require adjudication or whether judgment should be entered in accordance with this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE 94 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 52 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND GRANTING AND DENYING VARIOUS SEALING MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. The parties shall refile the documents previously filed under seal in accordance with this Order within ten days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRANSFER - Each party shall file a response(5 pages or fewer) to this Order by 4/24/2017. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/26/2017 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/19/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autodesk, Inc. v. Alter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Represented By: James P Gagen
Represented By: Jeannine Yoo Sano
Represented By: Allen W. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Alter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?