Weburg v. City of Eureka et al

Plaintiff: Alice Weburg
Defendant: City of Eureka and Kurt Hufft
Case Number: 3:2016cv04786
Filed: August 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER (pursuant to 32 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 25, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (CORRECTED) filed by Kurt Hufft, City of Eureka Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2017 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 1/25/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
September 29, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weburg v. City of Eureka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Weburg
Represented By: Shelley Kay Mack
Represented By: Peter Eric Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eureka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Hufft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?