Power Quality & Electrical Systems, Inc. et al v. BP West Coast Products LLC

Plaintiff: Power Quality & Electrical Systems, Inc., Rajinder K. Singh and Tejindar Singh
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04791
Filed: August 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER Compliance hearing re mediator name set 3/3/17 at 9:01am. Joint filing by 2/24/17. Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline 38 DENIED AS MOOT in light of this Order. Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/4/2017. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/24/2017. Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2017. Designation of Experts due by 7/31/2017. Dispositive Motion due by 10/2/2017. Rebuttal Reports due by 8/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7 /2017 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 2/12/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 2/12/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pr etrial Conference set for Friday, 2/2/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for Friday,1/5/2018 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/2/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 12, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Defendant BP shall file its answer within 21 days of this order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
November 3, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 19 Motion to Dismiss and Vacating Hearing. The Court VACATES the hearing set for November 15, 2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Quality & Electrical Systems, Inc. et al v. BP West Coast Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Quality & Electrical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Therese Yvonne Cannata
Represented By: Kevin Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajinder K. Singh
Represented By: Therese Yvonne Cannata
Represented By: Kevin Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tejindar Singh
Represented By: Therese Yvonne Cannata
Represented By: Kevin Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Daniel Richard Garner
Represented By: David Jeremy Simmons
Represented By: Melissa Marie Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?