Sobayo v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel Basola Sobayo
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Real Time Solutions, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. and Summit Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04798
Filed: August 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 108 RTR's Motion to Dismiss.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
February 23, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 102 Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
December 27, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying as moot 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
October 3, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing Date re 61 MOTION to Strike filed by Nathaniel Basola Sobayo, 62 MOTION to Strike filed by Nathaniel Basola Sobayo. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/03/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sobayo v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel R Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Basola Sobayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?