United States Postal Service v. City of Berkeley
Plaintiff: United States Postal Service
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Case Number: 3:2016cv04815
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER SETTING FORTH FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/14/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING 124 MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION FOLLOWING VIEWING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/2017. Responses due by 3/23/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/13/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING 11 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/23/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER 14 EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 12/1/2016. Replies due by 12/8/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Postal Service v. City of Berkeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Julia Alexandra Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?