Young et al

Plaintiff: Gloria Young and Margaret Cephas-Gross
Defendant: Holland America Line, N.V., Carnival Corporation dba Carniaval Cruise Line and CWC Travel Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04820
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by CWC Travel Inc., Holland America Line, N.V., Carnival Corporation dba Carniaval Cruise Line. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 14, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 19, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 5/19/2017 granting 62 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for a FRCP Rule 35 Psychological Examination of Plaintiff Young and Plaintiff Cephas-Gross. (tnS) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
December 28, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 27 Motion to Set Aside Default. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Young
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Represented By: John Herbert Scarpino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Cephas-Gross
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Represented By: John Herbert Scarpino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation dba Carniaval Cruise Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWC Travel Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?