Sabel v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Norman Sabel
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Greg Suhr, Tony Chaplin, Adam Eatia, William Kraus and Nikko Bravo
Case Number: 3:2016cv04832
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
August 25, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 26 Defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, and for Sanctions; and Ordering Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement, if any updates are appropriate, due by 8/21/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/25/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
June 29, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting case management conference and providing for dismissal if conditions not satisfied. Plaintiff's counsel to file declaration of service on Plaintiff by 7/10/2017. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/29/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
May 1, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE against Plaintiff's counsel as to why monetary sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to attend today's case management conference. Show Cause Response due by 5/8/2017. Order to Show Cause Hearing and Further Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2017 at 1:30 PM, in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/01/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabel v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Chaplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Eatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikko Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Sabel
Represented By: Timothy Elwood Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?