USA v. Home Loan Auditors et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Home Loan Auditors, LLC, Century Law Center, LLC, SOE Assistance Center, Inc, Spieker Law Office, Omar Alcaraz, Araceli Castro, Orelia Gutierrez, Hortencia Leon, Raul Luna, Elena Ramirez and David Spieker
Case Number: 3:2016cv04839
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 148 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 147 Discovery and Electronically Stored Information and Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/15/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
March 31, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/31/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
January 31, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 95 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Motion to Continue Hearing as modified by the court. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/31/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
November 30, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 29, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 23, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 43 Enlarging Time To Service Process On Unserved Defendants (45 days). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Home Loan Auditors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Loan Auditors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Law Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOE Assistance Center, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spieker Law Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Alcaraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Araceli Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orelia Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hortencia Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Spieker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher David Belen
Represented By: Varda Hussain
Represented By: Ronald H Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?