Home Depot U.S.A., Inc v. E.I. DuPont De Nemours & Company et al

Plaintiff: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours & Company, Huntsman International, LLC, Kronos Worldwide, Inc and Millennium Inorganic Chemicals, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv04865
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 57 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
October 5, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 20, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP, Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 13-1180. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc v. E.I. DuPont De Nemours & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: Lindsay Sklar Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Simmons Lee
Represented By: George Patrick Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kronos Worldwide, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Inorganic Chemicals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?