Cashon v. Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Valerie Cashon
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc. and Gentive Certified Healthcare Corp.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04889
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING THE FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 9, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 23 Motion to Stay. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
September 19, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT: Re 11 Stipulation filed by Gentive Certified Healthcare Corp., Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/19/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashon v. Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Cashon
Represented By: Brendan J. Begley
Represented By: Anthony Martin Perez, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Marie Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc.
Represented By: Alison Jacquelyn Cubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentive Certified Healthcare Corp.
Represented By: Alison Jacquelyn Cubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?