Koussa v. Yeung et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Koussa
Defendant: Ming Yeung, Jia Yeung and Leoncio Perez Santiago
Case Number: 3:2016cv05137
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/14/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 13, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 61 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
April 3, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting 42 Motion to Dismiss; denying 47 Motion to Amend/Correct. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
November 22, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 14 Ex Parte Application. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koussa v. Yeung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Koussa
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jia Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leoncio Perez Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?