Smaato, Inc. v. Mobilewalla, Inc.

Plaintiff: Smaato, Inc.
Defendant: Mobilewalla, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05162
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 22 MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER, ORDER RESTRAINING JUDGMENT DEBTOR, AND TURNOVER ORDER. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
February 2, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued as to Mobilewalla, Inc. in the amount of $263,123.92. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
November 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 7 Motion for Writ. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smaato, Inc. v. Mobilewalla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smaato, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Adam Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobilewalla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?