Richard Terry v. Hoovestol, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Terry
Defendant: Hoovestol, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05183
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 66 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 68 Motion for Settlement. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 62 Motion for Settlement. Fairness Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 55 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending The Parties Class Certification Related Expert Discovery Cut-Off By Twenty-One (21) Days filed by Richard Terry. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Richard Terry. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Mediation and Case Management Conference filed by Hoovestol, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Selecting Private ADR filed by Richard Terry. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Terry v. Hoovestol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoovestol, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Reed McKelvey
Represented By: Timothy Blair Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Terry
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: William David Turley
Represented By: Jill Marie Vecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?