Doe v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Doe and John Doe
Defendant: County of Sonoma, M.D. Lisa Walker, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, State of California, Department of Justice, State of California and Danielle Santos
Case Number: 3:2016cv05195
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 83 USCA Appeal Fee Received: $505.00, receipt number 34611148069 re #79 Notice of Appeal filed by John Doe. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
January 27, 2020 Remark Copy of #82 ORDER re IFP Status mailed to 9th Circuit (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re IFP Status. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/27/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2020 Filing 81 USCA Case Number 20-15035 9th Circuit for #79 Notice of Appeal filed by John Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER of USCA as to #79 Notice of Appeal 20-15035 filed by John Doe. This matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by John Doe. Appeal of Judgment #76 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 31, 2019 Filing 78 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Related documents(s) #77 ). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 76 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/20/2019. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/20/2019. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2019 Filing 74 Remark- Clerk called John Doe and left voicemail at 2:17 PM advising plaintiff that the hearing scheduled for tomorrow 12/19/19 at 10:00 AM has been taken off calendar and no appearance is necessary. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b), the Court finds the motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. #70 , to be suitable for decision without oral argument. The motion is taken under submission, and the hearing that was set for December 19, 2019, is vacated. The Courtroom Deputy will call plaintiff to advise him of this order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 72 REPLY (re #70 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySteve Macdonald, Danielle Santos, Lisa Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hamilton, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 71 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #70 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJohn Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steve Macdonald, Lisa Walker, Danielle Santos. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/26/2019. Replies due by 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hamilton, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/4/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 68 AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, State of California, State of California, Department of Justice, Lisa Walker. Filed byJohn Doe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #49 Motion to Dismiss; granting #56 Motion to Dismiss. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 66 Mail sent to John Doe returned as undeliverable re #62 Order Cancelling Deadline, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 65 Letter dated 5/13/19 from John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO SUE UNDER A PSEUDONYM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/10/2019. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 63 Mail sent to John Doe returned as undeliverable re #59 Order, Terminate Motions. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/1/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 61 Request for Judicial Notice filed byJohn Doe. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 60 OBJECTIONS to re #57 Request for Judicial Notice, by John Doe. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE #51 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/10/2019. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 58 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJohn Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 57 Request for Judicial Notice re #56 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCounty of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C)(Related document(s) #56 ) (Hamilton, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss filed by County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/11/2019. Replies due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hamilton, Bonnie) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 55 Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed byState of California, State of California, Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogoyski, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 53 Statement of Non-Opposition re #51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed byState of California, State of California, Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Rogoyski, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byState of California, State of California, Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogoyski, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for leave to proceed as pseudonymous filed by John Doe, John Doe. Responses due by 4/15/2019. Replies due by 4/29/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 50 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJohn Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of California, State of California, Department of Justice. Responses due by 4/5/2019. Replies due by 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogoyski, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen James Rogoyski (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogoyski, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by John Doe re #36 Order NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MORRISON & FOERSTER, LLP AS COUNSEL (Tarantino, William) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Doe-updated. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2019: #1 Envelope) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2019: #3 Envelope) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2018 Filing 45 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Settlement. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: Settlement Conference held on 7/25/2018.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: William F. Tarantino, Esq. Defendant Attorney: Bonnie Hamilton, Esq. Attachment: Settlement Conference held. Case did not settle. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/26/2018)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge: Settlement Conference set for 7/25/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, CA, in Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2018. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/6/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2018 Filing 41 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/26/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
October 23, 2017 Filing 40 ADR Remark: The ADR Program is in receipt of Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference #39 . No ADR Phone Conference is needed because case is already referred to a settlement conference #35 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 20, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Tarantino, William) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. #13 Motion to Dismiss terminated in light of settlement proceedings. The motion may be renewed if needed after the settlement conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/8/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bonnie A. Hamilton and Change of Firm Name (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hamilton, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/6/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 20, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #32 Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. The Court refers the parties to a settlement conference with Magistrate Judge James, to be scheduled at her convenience and after pro se counsel is appointed. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/19/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2017 Filing 34 REPLY (re #32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ) filed byJohn Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ) /Non-Opposition to Limited Appointment of Counsel for Settlement Conference Purposes Only filed byCounty of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel with Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration in Support filed by John Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order re #22 Motion to Remove Document. Signed by Judge James Donato on February 27, 2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Docket No. 19) filed by County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Lisa Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISSOLVING OSC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/13/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 Filing 28 Response to Order to Show Cause #23 Order to Show Cause, byJohn Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 1, 2017 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. State of California, Department of Justice served on 12/19/2016, answer due 1/9/2017. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
February 1, 2017 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. County of Sonoma served on 11/28/2016, answer due 12/19/2016. Lisa Walker served 11/28/16, answer due 12/19/16. Steve McDonald served on 11/28/16, answer due 12/19/16. Sonoma County Health Services served 11/28/16, answer due 12/19/16. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 30, 2017 Filing 25 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference not held on 1/26/2017., Motion Hearing not held on 1/26/2017. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lisa Walker, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, County of Sonoma Total Time in Court 12 Minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2017)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/9/2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/26/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to file complaint as pseudonymous plaintiff filed by John Doe. Responses due by 2/2/2017. Replies due by 2/9/2017. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 20 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. (Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 19 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. (Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/19/2017) Modified on 1/19/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2017 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJohn Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 17 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) & Objection to Late Filed Opposition filed byCounty of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. (Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed County of Sonoma served on 12/19/2016, answer due 1/9/2017; Steve Macdonald served on 11/28/2016, answer due 12/19/2016; Sonoma County Department of Health Services served on 11/28/2016, answer due 12/19/2016; State of California served on 11/28/2016, answer due 12/19/2016; State of California, Department of Justice served on 11/28/2016, answer due 12/19/2016; Lisa Walker served on 11/28/2016, answer due 12/19/2016. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 19, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference continued to 1/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCounty of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, Lisa Walker. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/3/2017. Replies due by 1/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Freeman, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt re #11 Summons Issued. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, State of California, State of California, Department of Justice, Lisa Walker. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2016: #1 usm) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2016 Filing 10 Letter dated 10/28/2016 from John Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 9 Address Letter for Defendants'. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2016 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference continued to 12/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #4 Ex Parte Motion. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2016 Filing 5 Proposed Order re #4 MOTION by John Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 9, 2016 Filing 4 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Complaint as Pseudonymous Plaintiff filed by John Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 9, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Doe. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 9, 2016 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2016 01:30 PM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2016: #1 Standing Order) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Sonoma, Steve Macdonald, Sonoma County Department of Health Services, State of California, State of California, Department of Justice, Lisa Walker. Filed byJohn Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2016: #2 Envelope) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Bonnie A. Freeman
Represented By: Bonnie A. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Lisa Walker
Represented By: Bonnie A. Freeman
Represented By: Bonnie A. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Macdonald
Represented By: Bonnie A. Freeman
Represented By: Bonnie A. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Department of Health Services
Represented By: Bonnie A. Freeman
Represented By: Bonnie A. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California, Department of Justice
Represented By: Robert Stephen James Rogoyski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Robert Stephen James Rogoyski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Santos
Represented By: Bonnie A. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: William Francis Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?