Cardenas et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Rita Cardenas, L.V., L.M. and David Ortiz
Defendant: City Of Oakland, County of Alameda, Scott Seder, Richard Coglio and Victor Garcia
Case Number: 3:2016cv05205
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Victor Ramirez, Victor Fox, Michael Buckhout. Settlement conference statement to be lodged by 6/5/2018. Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/6/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO AMEND by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE RE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/19/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 36 Motion to Dismiss]. Motion due by 5/18/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, Motions terminated: 32 Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/2/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 27 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup [finding as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss]. Amended Complaint due by NOON on 2/16/2017. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Motion to dismiss due by NOON ON 3/2/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT COMPLAINT TO ASSERT NEW PATENT AND VACATING HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint., Motions terminated: 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Rita Cardenas. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/29/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Seder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Coglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Cardenas
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.V.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.M.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ortiz
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?