Mangiaracina et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Joel Mangiaracina and Ranee Chaloeicheep
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Contra Costa Transportation Authority and Contra Costa County
Case Number: 3:2016cv05270
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 61 Motion for Joinder. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
June 15, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 61 First MOTION for Joinder of Necessary Party filed by Joel Mangiaracina. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
April 26, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Confidentiality Agreement filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
February 2, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, BNSF Railway Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 12, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 15 Motion to Remand. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mangiaracina et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Flesher
Represented By: Jason Wendall Schaff
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Flesher
Represented By: Jason Wendall Schaff
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Transportation Authority
Represented By: Michael Cruz Rocha
Represented By: Chad Steven Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Represented By: Christopher B. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Mangiaracina
Represented By: Anthony Steven Petru
Represented By: Paula A. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranee Chaloeicheep
Represented By: Anthony Steven Petru
Represented By: Paula A. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?