Shenwick v. Twitter, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Doris Shenwick
Defendant: Twitter, Inc., Richard Costolo and Anthony Noto
Case Number: 3:2016cv05314
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing on Twitter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Noto, Richard Costolo, Twitter, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
April 3, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by KBC Asset Management NV filed by KBC Asset Management NV. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
January 18, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: SCHEDULING AND REQUEST TO ASSOCIATE ADDITIONAL COUNSEL filed by KBC Asset Management NV. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
December 22, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying (38) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (38) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (47) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (47) Mo tion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (20) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (27) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (29) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (29) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:16-cv-05314-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
October 21, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE AND VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL filed by Anthony Noto, Richard Costolo, Twitter, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shenwick v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Shenwick
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Abraham
Represented By: Daniel S. Drosman
Represented By: David Conrad Walton
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Simona Gurevich Strauss
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Costolo
Represented By: Simona Gurevich Strauss
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Noto
Represented By: Simona Gurevich Strauss
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?