Stewart, et al v. Bank of America , N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Charles Stewart and Kara Michelle Stewart
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A., US Bank Trust Company, N.A. and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05322
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice After Settlement filed by Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
January 4, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY MATTER AND TAKE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR filed by US Bank Trust Company, N.A., Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 28, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 5 Motion to Dismiss; denying 17 Motion to Remand. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart, et al v. Bank of America , N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Represented By: Alison Valerie Lippa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Charles Stewart
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kelly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Michelle Stewart
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kelly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?