Acres v. Blue Lake Rancheria et al

Plaintiff: James Raymond Acres
Defendant: Blue Lake Rancheria, Tribal Court and Lester Marston
Case Number: 3:2016cv05391
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 53 Motion for TRO. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
February 24, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 11, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 33 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Motion to be filed by 1/24/2017. Opposition to be filed by 2/7/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. The prior order permitting discovery and a deposition of Judge Marston is stayed in all respects. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acres v. Blue Lake Rancheria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Raymond Acres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Lake Rancheria
Represented By: Daniel Scott Stouder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?