Holley et al v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William Jeff Holley and Phillip Calvin
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. and One World Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05475
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
December 29, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 11 Motion to Remand. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 9, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE FILING AND SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF - deadline extended to 11/30/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/9/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 8, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Remand. Response due by 11/22/2016. Reply due by 11/29/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 12/21/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/8/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holley et al v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Cidre
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Cidre
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jeff Holley
Represented By: John E. Hill
Represented By: Denise Mejlszenkier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Calvin
Represented By: John E. Hill
Represented By: Denise Mejlszenkier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?