Savin v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Katharine Savin
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, Bruce Lery, Heather Harris, M.D. and Anne Kinderman, M.D.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05627
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 7/24/2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 6, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Katharine Savin. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
March 22, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Archdiocese of San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
February 8, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Archdiocese of San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 5, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Archdiocese of San Francisco Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savin v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine Savin
Represented By: Scott A. Brown
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Lery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Harris, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Kinderman, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?