S.S. v. Oakland Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: S.S. (a minor) by and through Jill and Kris Sulka as Guardians ad Litem for S.S.
Defendant: Oakland Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2016cv05632
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 37 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement of Minor's Claim. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
July 7, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulation AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
January 23, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. denying 18 Stipulation and Setting Schedule: Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/14/2017; Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/13/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (5-day) set for 12/4/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.S. v. Oakland Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Unified School District
Represented By: Claudia Leed
Represented By: Louis A. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S. (a minor) by and through Jill and Kris Sulka as Guardians ad Litem for S.S.
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Mandy G. Leigh
Represented By: Nathan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?