Barker v. Chanault et al.,

Plaintiff: Kenneth Barker
Defendant: Kenneth I. Chanault and The American Express Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv05647
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EXHIBITS TO OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/24/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
June 14, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/14/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 12, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME re 71 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Kenneth Barker, 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Early Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The American Express Company. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/12/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 8, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME by Hon. William Alsup granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF DEFENDANTS re 52 MOTION to Substitute Party American Express Centurion Bank as Defendant filed by The American Express Company Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/7/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
March 13, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. Motions due by 3/23/2017.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 3, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
January 27, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO THE FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/27/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
October 13, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Chanault et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth I. Chanault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?