Coyle v. Equifax, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Coyle
Defendant: Equifax, Inc., Bank of America, National Association and HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv05675
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Stipulation for dismissal of defendant Equifax, Inc. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 1, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/1/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
March 28, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation for dismissal of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
February 13, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant HSBC Bank, USA, National Association. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 4, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 17 MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 29, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyle v. Equifax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Coyle
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?