Cruz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Davina Cruz
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Comenity, LLC, First Hawaii Bank, TD Bank USA, National Association, Bank of America, National Association and Citibank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv05676
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiff Davina Cruz. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/13/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 28, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 78 Motion to Dismiss]. Amended Pleadings due by NOON on 4/11/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
January 23, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Motions due by 2/9/2017. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/23/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 18, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 61 STIPULATION TO DISMISS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
December 22, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 50 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ELLEN SILVERMAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 21, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 47 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 1, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW SOUKUP PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 30, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 30 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
October 16, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 . Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Cruz
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Michelle McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Hawaii Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Anthony Q. Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?