Hughes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie Hughes
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05681
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (51 in 3:16-cv-06329-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (for dismissal of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.) filed by Rhodora Cristobal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
May 22, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Stephanie Hughes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
March 13, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hughes
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?