Juana Mamisay v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Juana Mamisay
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., American Honda Finance Corporation, Citibank, National Association and JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv05684
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Monday, 9/11/2017 at 02:01 PM. Show Cause Response due by Friday, 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/6/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
August 7, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS TO DEFENDANTS' CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6): DENYING MOTION AS TO MAMISAY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 78 Motion to Dismiss. Answer filed 8/21/2017. Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
April 12, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINTS; BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING STAY; DENYING STIPULATIONS AS MOOT; AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN CASE NO. 17-CV-0416. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/12/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
March 21, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss; granting 27 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs response filed within seven days of this order. Case temporarily stayed until briefing completed. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
January 25, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Inc.'s 45 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
December 16, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing as to Defendant American Honda Finance Corporation is set for 1/13/2017 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/16/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 15, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
November 23, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juana Mamisay v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Mamisay
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?