Jugoz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rudolph Jugoz
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Credit One Bank, National Association and American Honda Finance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv05687
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. terminated. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
August 15, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/14/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 7, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS EQUIFAX, INC. Equifax, Inc. terminated. In light of the dismissal, Equifax's motion to appear telephonically at the August 11, 2017 Case Management Conference is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 26, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MONETARY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing, no later than August 2, 2017, why monetary sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 17, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Plaintiff is ordered to submit a chambers copy of his amended complaint no later than July 24, 2017, and is advised that if no chamber copy is submitted by that date, the amended complaint will be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 13, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendant Credit One Bank, National Association shall file, no later than August 11, 2017, its response to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 23, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN AND EQUIFAX'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Should plaintiff wish to file an amended pleading, such amended complaint shall be filed no la ter than July 7, 2017. In light thereof, the Case Management Conference is continued from July 14, 2017, to August 11, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 2, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 16, 2017, to July 14, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/02/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 15, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The hearings scheduled for May 19, 2017 on defendants Experian and Equifax's motions to dismiss are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
April 24, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The hearings on Experian, Equifax, and Credit One Bank's motions to dismiss are continued to May 19, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
March 29, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearings on Experian, Equifax, and Credit One Bank's motions to dismiss are continued to April 28, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. The Initia l Case Management Conference is continued to June 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017) Modified on 3/29/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/29/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 20, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX, INC. AND CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The hearings are continued to April 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 5, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference set for January 13, 2017, is continued to May 12, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 28, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Pursuant to stipulation, Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A. shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint no later than January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 22, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORP. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/8/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 2, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT EQUIFAX, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT. Defendant Equifax, Inc.'s time to respond to the initial complaint is extended to January 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/2/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/1/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 18, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/18/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jugoz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Jugoz
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Michelle McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?