Howard Rydolph v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Howard Rydolph
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Ally Financial, Inc., Military Star, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and WebBank
Case Number: 3:2016cv05694
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiff Howard Rydolph. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/13/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 28, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 57 Motion to Dismiss]. Amended Pleadings due by NOON on 4/11/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
January 23, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Motions due by 2/9/2017. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/23/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 19, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 50 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WEBBANK WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
December 14, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 27 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard Rydolph v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Rydolph
Represented By: Joe B. Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Celia M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Chelsea Lynn Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?