Naggie v. City of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Angela Naggie
Defendant: City of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department and SFPD Officer David Goff
Case Number: 3:2016cv05767
Filed: October 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/27/2017 02:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/2/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
July 24, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Spero for all purposes, including trial and entry of judgment. The Initial Case Management Conference presently set for 7/31/17 is vacated pending reassignment to Magistrate Judge Spero. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/24/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 11, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE;CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/24/2017 02:01 PM. Show Cause Response due by 7/17/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2017 is CONTINUED to Monday, 7/24/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
January 24, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: hearing on Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff is ordered to pay sanctions to the Clerk of Court by February 3, 2017. Any written contests to the amount of such sanctions must be filed by January 27, 2017. Furthermore, plaintiff must serve and provide proof of service on defendants by February 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/24/2017. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 4, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/20/2017 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/13/2017. The Court VACATES the case management conference currently set for 1/9/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/4/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naggie v. City of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Naggie
Represented By: James Paul Segall-Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPD Officer David Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?