Apple Inc. v. Mobile Star LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff Apple Inc. alleged that Defendant Mobile Star LLC sold counterfeit power adapters and charging cables with Apple's trademarks and copyrighted artwork on Amazon and Groupon. Apple alleged that these counterfeit products were not subjected to industry-standard consumer safety testing, were poorly constructed with inferior or missing components, flawed designs and inadequate insulation, and lacked safety features to protect users from shock and fire hazards.

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Mobile Star LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06001
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2016 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON APPLE'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Apple Inc.. (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 20, 2016 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 19 Declaration in Support, 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 18 Declaration in Support, 15 Declaration in Support,, 14 Declaration in Support,, 16 Declaration in Support, 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, 17 Declaration in Support, (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 20, 2016 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Erick Lauridsen (Lauridsen, Steven) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 20, 2016 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K. Brookey (Brookey, Brian) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 19, 2016 Set Deadlines omitted from initial docketing of 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Response due by 11/2/2016. Reply due by 11/9/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 19 Declaration in Support, 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 18 Declaration in Support, 15 Declaration in Support,, 14 Declaration in Support,, 16 Declaration in Support, 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, 17 Declaration in Support, (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 19 Declaration of Nathan Shaffer in Support of 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 13 , 12 ) (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 18 Declaration of Paul Stone-Jansen in Support of 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 12 , 13 ) (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 17 Declaration of Robert N. Potter in Support of 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 12 , 13 ) (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 16 Declaration of Robert Pearson in Support of 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 13 , 12 ) (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 15 Declaration of Marianne David in Support of 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 12 , 13 ) (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 14 Declaration of David Doan in Support of 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 12 , 13 ) (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/2/2016. Replies due by 11/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 19, 2016 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion, # 2 Exhibit B to Motion, # 3 Exhibit C to Motion, # 4 Exhibit D to Motion, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Exhibit A to Proposed Order, # 7 Exhibit B to Proposed Order, # 8 Exhibit C to Proposed Order, # 9 Exhibit D to Proposed Order)(Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 18, 2016 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 10 Summons Issued as to Mobile Star LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2017 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/18/16. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 8 Case assigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 17, 2016 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy Ching Shyong (Shyong, Cathy) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D Shaffer (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Rutowski (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 4 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc. (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/17/2016) Modified on 10/18/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2016 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. re 1 Complaint, (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 2 Proposed Summons. (Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Mobile Star LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10857337.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zellerbach, Thomas) (Filed on 10/17/2016) Modified on 10/18/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Mobile Star LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Petersen
Represented By: Diana Rutowski
Represented By: Nathan D Shaffer
Represented By: Cathy Ching Shyong
Represented By: Thomas H. Zellerbach(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Star LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Brookey
Represented By: Joshua Michael Geller(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Steven Erick Lauridsen
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?