Northfield Insurance Company v. Civic Center Hotel, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Civic Center Hotel, LLC, Balwantsinh "Bill" Thakor, Lataben B. Thakor and U.A. Local 38 Pension Trust Fund
Case Number: 3:2016cv06056
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/08/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
March 8, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY by Judge William H. Orrick re 26 Motion to Dismiss. Parties to file Status Report due by 9/8/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
January 30, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORAL ARGUMENT FOR ALL PENDING MOTIONS AND ORDER granting 59 STIPULATION. Set/Reset Deadlines: Hearing as to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 26 MOTION to Dismiss, and 50 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment set for 3/1/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17, 16th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northfield Insurance Company v. Civic Center Hotel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Represented By: Lenell Topol McCallum
Represented By: Alexander Eugene Potente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civic Center Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Alexander J. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balwantsinh "Bill" Thakor
Represented By: Alexander J. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lataben B. Thakor
Represented By: Alexander J. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.A. Local 38 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: James P. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?