Derosier v. Global Hawk Insurance Company (RRG)

Plaintiff: Brittney Derosier
Defendant: Global Hawk Insurance Company (RRG)
Case Number: 3:2016cv06069
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brittney Derosier; ORDER discharging 26 order to show cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/27/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 17, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brittney Derosier; ORDER discharging 26 order to show cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/17/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
January 26, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONVERTING 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re 17 Order on Motion to Remand, Denying attorney fees filed by Brittney Derosier into a Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Hearing set for 3/16/2017 11:00 AM in C ourtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Defendant's Opposition due by 2/17/2017. Plaintiff's reply due by 2/24/2017. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Dominic G. Flamiano. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/16/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Show Cause Response due by 2/17/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/26/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
December 20, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave of court to file 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re 17 Order on Motion to Remand, Denying attorney fees filed by Brittney Derosier. ORDER considering 20 as filed. ORDER Setting Hearing on 20 MOTION for Reconsideration for 2/2/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Defendant's opposition due by 1/13/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/20/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
November 23, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Remand and for Attorney's Fees. The action is remanded to Alameda County Superior Court. The request for attorney's fees is denied.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derosier v. Global Hawk Insurance Company (RRG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Hawk Insurance Company (RRG)
Represented By: Dominic G. Flamiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Derosier
Represented By: Donald P. Brigham
Represented By: Donald P. Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?