Mendaros v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Mark A Mendaros
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Select Porfolio Servicing, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and James E. Albertelli, PA
Case Number: 3:2016cv06092
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/3/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
May 31, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 9 , 12 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
December 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 32 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John M. Sorich; Bryant Steven Delgadillo; and David Ming Liu terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 25, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendaros v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Mendaros
Represented By: Timothy Lee McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Porfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Gina Lorraine Albertson
Represented By: Namson Nguyen Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Gina Lorraine Albertson
Represented By: Namson Nguyen Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Albertelli, PA
Represented By: Julie Ellen Corriveau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?