Spectra Licensing Group, LLC v. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Spectra Licensing Group, LLC
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor Inc. and Marvell Technology Group LTD
Case Number: 3:2016cv06093
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 to Dismiss all Claims and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 68 to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/14/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FOURTH JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 to stay deadlines pending settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 THIRD JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 62 TO STAY DEADLINES PENDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1917. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY DEADLINES PENDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/5/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER to stay deadlines pending settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/5/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 44 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 31 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectra Licensing Group, LLC v. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectra Licensing Group, LLC
Represented By: Adam Spencer Garson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Joseph Courtney
Represented By: Ian Robert Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Technology Group LTD
Represented By: Ian Robert Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?