Sandoval v. Chipotle Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Carmen Cortes Sandoval
Defendant: Chipotle Services, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Claudia Chotoj
Case Number: 3:2016cv06122
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
May 17, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Stipulation TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
February 14, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 8, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and ORDER re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/8/2017. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 3, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 1, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 26, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Chipotle Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Services, LLC
Represented By: Allan Brian Claybon
Represented By: Robert Bruce Hinckley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Allan Brian Claybon
Represented By: Robert Bruce Hinckley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Chotoj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Cortes Sandoval
Represented By: Michael Hyungchoon Kim
Represented By: Melanie Diane Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?