The Regents of the University of California v. St. Jude Medical, Inc.

Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06210
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES; RESETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting in part 103 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/7/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/8/2018. Dispositive Motion due by 9/21/2018. Opening Reports due by 6/29/2018. Rebuttal Reports due by 8/10/2018. Joint Pretrial Statement filed by 2/8/2019. Jury Selection set for 3/11/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtro om 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/22/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing re pretrial preparation is set for Friday, 2/1/2019 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 3, 2018 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE re (98 in 4:16-cv-06210-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC, The Regents of the University of California, (86 in 4:16-cv-06266-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, St. Jude Medical, LLC, The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/3/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
April 20, 2018 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER SUBMISSION RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE re (98 in 4:16-cv-06210-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC, The Regents of the University of California, (86 in 4:16-cv-06266-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, St. Jude Medical, LLC, The Regents of the University of California. Status Report due by 4/27/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/20/18. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
May 30, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 28 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 5, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING AMENDMENT OF INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS IN RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES; EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' PATENT L.R. 3-4 DOCUMENT PRODUCTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Regents of the University of California v. St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Mark T. Jansen
Represented By: Galen P. Sallomi
Represented By: Pilar Stillwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Esha Bandyopadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?