Chand v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Saleshni Chand
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc and American Honda Finance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv06311
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING r 39 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/26/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 16, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/16/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
March 20, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO DISMISS, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; Tentatively granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss ; Plaintiff's request for leave to amend is granted. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
December 16, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing re American Honda Finance Corporation is set for Friday, 1/13/2017 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/16/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 15, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chand v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saleshni Chand
Represented By: Joe B. Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation
Represented By: Rockford Marcello Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?